MD SB427 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB426
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition in Baltimore County against hunting or attempting to hunt nongame birds and mammals without first obtaining a hunting license.
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-8) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB426 (Carry Over) 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
HB682 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
HB682 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |