MD SB415 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that specified disclosure statements in pre-need contracts inform a buyer whether the contract is a guaranteed contract, guaranteed in part contract, or nonguaranteed contract; providing that if specified disclosures are made, pre-need contracts may be guaranteed contracts, guaranteed in part contracts, or nonguaranteed contracts and may include cash advance items or goods and services that are not guaranteed; providing that a pre-need escrow or trust account may not be deemed an asset of specified licensees; etc.
Title
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {416587/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {544433/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Getty) Adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {544433/1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {544433/1 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Estates and Trusts
Funerals
Health Occupations
Morticians
Prices
Contracts
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Estates and Trusts
Funerals
Health Occupations
Morticians
Prices