MD SB412 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Maryland Pharmacy Act does not prohibit, under specified circumstances, a licensed dentist from dispensing a full course of treatment of antibiotics to a patient for infection control.
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Dyson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {444532/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |