MD SB410 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for original jurisdiction of the District Court for specified actions; prohibiting a person without authorization from the State Highway Administration from placing a sign within the right-of- way of a State highway; clarifying that such signs may be removed by the Administration or other designated agencies; authorizing the Administration or a specified county or municipal corporation government to collect civil penalties and to seek an injunction against specified violations; etc.
Title
State Highway Administration - Unauthorized Signs on Highway Rights-of-Way
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {813829/1 Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {813829/1 Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-04 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (39-8) | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (34-12) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (17-30) | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Advertising
Civil Actions
Counties
District Courts
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Reports
Signs and Billboards
Civil Actions
Counties
District Courts
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Reports
Signs and Billboards