MD SB38 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a State Advisory Council on Health and Wellness to address chronic disease in the State by repealing and consolidating three existing State advisory councils that address physical fitness, arthritis, and heart disease and stroke; altering the membership of the State Child Fatality Review Team to include specified representatives; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments {696080/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {847772/1 Report Adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-09-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Associations
Children, Governor's Office for
Committees and Commissions
Death
Diseases
General Assembly
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Minors
Nurses
Physicians
Public Health
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Children, Governor's Office for
Committees and Commissions
Death
Diseases
General Assembly
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Minors
Nurses
Physicians
Public Health
Public Information
Rules and Regulations