MD SB368 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence; requiring the Commission to submit a specified report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1 of each year; and repealing the termination date of the Commission; etc.
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership and Termination Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-6) (Y: 126 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6) |
2014-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753199/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Health
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Health
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology