MD SB34 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB97
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who has been convicted of a crime punishable by imprisonment exceeding 1 year and is currently serving the sentence imposed for the conviction, including a term of parole or probation, or has been convicted of a crime involving or relating to perjury, witness intimidation, jury intimidation, bribing a public employee or juror, fraud, or a related crime is not qualified for jury service.
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-10) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {933421/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 3:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB97 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Bribery
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Crimes and Punishments
Fraud
Juries
Parole and Probation
Perjury
Witnesses
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Crimes and Punishments
Fraud
Juries
Parole and Probation
Perjury
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 8 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |