MD SB318 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City and the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit to offset specified stormwater remediation fees; authorizing counties and municipal corporations to determine the amount of the tax credit; requiring counties to provide a specified notification to municipal corporations before taking specified actions; providing that specified property used for specified purposes may not receive the credit; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Sunshine Tax Credit Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties
Environmental Matters
Fees
Flood Control
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pollution
Property Tax
Public Information
Real Property
Reports
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Water
Counties
Environmental Matters
Fees
Flood Control
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pollution
Property Tax
Public Information
Real Property
Reports
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Water