MD SB280 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that a notary public use a certain protest form.
Title
Notarial Acts - Protest Form Requirement - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95 |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2024-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-09-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 18 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |