MD SB248 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions that provide for a direct wine seller's permit; establishing a direct wine shipper's permit to be issued by the Office of the Comptroller; authorizing the Office to issue a common carrier permit to specified persons; requiring a person to obtain a permit before engaging in shipping wine directly to a direct wine consumer in the State; requiring an applicant to meet qualifications for a direct wine shipper's permit, submit an application and documentation, and pay a fee; specifying the term of a direct wine shipper's permit; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipment
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. David Brinkley [R] | Sen. James Brochin [D] |
Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2011-04-08 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Rejected | |
2011-03-24 | Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Raskin) Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) Withdrawn | |
2011-03-23 | Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Raskin) Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Auditors and Audits
Blue Laws
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Commerce
Excise Tax
Fees
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Labeling
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Security Interests
Signatures
Transportation
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Auditors and Audits
Blue Laws
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Commerce
Excise Tax
Fees
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Labeling
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Security Interests
Signatures
Transportation