MD SB244 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning January 1, 2023, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide coverage for self-measured blood pressure monitoring.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Self-Measured Blood Pressure Monitoring
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB534 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Subjects
Communications
Data
Drugs
Education
Equipment
Examinations
Health Occupations
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Patients
Public Health
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Work, Labor, and Employment
Data
Drugs
Education
Equipment
Examinations
Health Occupations
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Patients
Public Health
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |