MD SB232 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain provisions of the Public Employee Relations Act, including adding the definition of interested employee organization, altering the timing of exclusive representative access to new employees, clarifying the responsibilities of certain deputy directors, and clarifying the process for certain investigations of unfair labor practices.
Title
Public Employee Relations Act - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-34) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB144 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Communications
Education - Miscellaneous
Electronic Communication
Public Employees
State Government - Personnel
Strikes
Communications
Education - Miscellaneous
Electronic Communication
Public Employees
State Government - Personnel
Strikes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 22 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 22 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 22 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 22 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 22 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 22 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |