MD SB232 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Elevator Safety Review Board to provide a certification of licensure on request of any person and on payment of a specified fee set by the Board; providing for specified information to be contained in the certification of licensure; requiring the Board to reinstate an expired license under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board - Licensing
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-06 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 797772/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-24 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Finance |