MD SB224 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "prosecutor" to include the State Prosecutor or Deputy State Prosecutor under provisions of law related to compulsory witness testimony and witness immunity under specified circumstances.
Title
State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory Testimony
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |