MD SB187 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authority of the Division of Correction to arrange for inmates not needed or being used by the State Highway Administration to perform emergency road work to be employed in agricultural work during any part of the year at a camp in Queen Anne's County or any other county with a similar camp.
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Employment - Agricultural Work
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-21) |
2024-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB94 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 9 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |