MD SB175 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of electronic communication to maliciously engage in a course of conduct that alarms or seriously annoys another under specified circumstances; changing the defined term "electronic mail" to "electronic communication" and altering the definition; and making violation of the Act a misdemeanor punishable by imprisonment not exceeding 1 year or a fine not exceeding $500 or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Electronic Communication - Harassment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-28 - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-10 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-28 Third Reading Passed (135-0)
2012-03-27 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-27 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-30 Favorable Report by Judiciary
2012-03-21 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-17 First Reading Judiciary
2012-03-27 Returned Passed
2012-03-16 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-03-14 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-14 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) 583326/1 Adopted
2012-03-14 Favorable with Amendments 168979/1 Report Adopted
2012-03-13 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2012-03-13 Favorable with Amendments 168979/1
2012-03-12 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2012-01-24 Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-01-20 First Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback