MD SB171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a participation goal for specified veteran-owned small business enterprises for specified procurement contracts; requiring a unit to award procurement contracts to specified bidders or offerors under specified circumstances; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations; establishing prohibited acts and penalties for violations; etc.
Title
Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] |
Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. David Harrington [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Civil Actions
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Fraud
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Veterans
Attorney General
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Civil Actions
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Fraud
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Veterans