MD SB15 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the process for and circumstances under which a banking institution may engage in any additional activity, service, or other practice that is authorized for national banking associations; requiring a written notice to the Commissioner of Financial Regulation at least 45 calendar days before engaging in any additional activity; the Commissioner may prohibit certain activity or service if it is determined the performance of a certain activity would adversely affect the safety and soundness of the financial institution; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-1) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {667577/1 Adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Disclosure
Ethics
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Notices
Time
Disclosure
Ethics
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Notices
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 5 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |