MD SB1117 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Ward 25, precinct 4 of the 44th Legislative District in Baltimore City to the list of areas in which the Board of Liquor License Commissioners may issue a Class BWLT beer, wine, and liquor tasting license to a holder of a Class A beer, wine and liquor license.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BWLT Tasting Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City