MD HB929 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a Class 9 limited distillery license to be issued to a holder of a specified Class B license in Garrett County; altering the underlying licenses that may be held by a recipient of a Class BDR (deluxe restaurant) beer and wine license issued in Garrett County; altering the alcoholic beverages that may be sold for on-premises consumption and off-premises consumption at a hotel, motel, or restaurant; repealing specified Sunday sales license fees; altering the hours of sale on Sunday for specified licenses; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {583890/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Boundaries
Garrett County
Hotels and Motels
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Boundaries
Garrett County
Hotels and Motels
Restaurants
Retail Sales