MD HB924 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a merchant from using a wireless Internet signal or a cellular phone to monitor the behavior or shopping habits of a specified consumer unless the merchant displays at each entrance to the merchant's business premises a specified notice in a specified manner; providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and is subject to specified enforcement and penalty provisions; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsors
Del. Sam Arora [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] |
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 88 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-47) |
2014-03-13 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Bates) Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Surveillance
Notices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Surveillance
Notices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices