MD HB854 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a person required to register as a sex offender in a county with a population of more than 300,000 residents may register at any location designated by a county law enforcement agency; and requiring a county law enforcement agency in a certain county to designate at least two locations in the county where a person required to register may register.
Title
Sex Offenders - Required Registration - Locations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {633525/1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |