MD HB801 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB890
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including infrastructure replacement project costs under the Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement Program in certain gas company base rates during a multiyear rate plan; and continuing an annual surcharge for eligible future infrastructure project costs not included in certain gas company base rates during a multiyear rate plan.
Title
Natural Gas - Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement - Surcharge and Plans (STRIDE Act of 2022)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB890 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 4 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |