MD HB770 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period within which a court may prohibit a person convicted under certain circumstances of operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol from operating a vessel on the waters of the State; requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in coordination with the Natural Resources Police Force, to establish and maintain a database of persons prohibited from operating a vessel on the waters of the State due to a certain conviction for operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol; etc.
Title
Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703624/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB740 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Death
Disclosure
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Electronic Documents
Electronic Government
Fines
Identification
Law Enforcement
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Time
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Water
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Death
Disclosure
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Electronic Documents
Electronic Government
Fines
Identification
Law Enforcement
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Time
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 8 | 738 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 738.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |