MD HB759 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring advanced practice registered nurses practicing as an advanced practice registered nurse in the State to notify patients in writing if the nurse does not maintain professional liability insurance coverage or if the coverage has lapsed and not been renewed; requiring that the notification be provided at certain visits and as part of certain informed consents, signed by a patient at certain times, and retained as part of the advanced practice registered nurse's patient records; etc.
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB996 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Liability
Notices
Nurses
Signs and Billboards
Disclosure
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Liability
Notices
Nurses
Signs and Billboards
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 8 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |