MD HB658 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government to study how to improve the administrative process for resolving appeals under the Maryland Public Information Act; requiring the Joint Committee to report its findings to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government - Study on Appeals Under the Maryland Public Information Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {956887/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Administrative Procedure Act
Appeals
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Evidence
Fees
General Assembly
Inspections
Judicial Review
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Sunset
Administrative Procedure Act
Appeals
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Evidence
Fees
General Assembly
Inspections
Judicial Review
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Sunset