MD HB656 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "serious crime" to provide that a register of wills or court may not grant letters of administration to a person convicted of a crime that reflects adversely on an individual's honesty, trustworthiness, or fitness to perform the duties of a personal representative; providing an exception; prohibiting a court, unless good cause is shown, from appointing, as a guardian of the person of a minor or disabled person, a person who has been convicted of a specified crime; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Keiffer Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Ex-Offenders
Guardians
Minors
Personal Representatives
Registers of Wills
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Ex-Offenders
Guardians
Minors
Personal Representatives
Registers of Wills