MD HB63 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering eligibility for a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax on the dwelling house of certain disabled veterans to include individuals who have been declared by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs to have a nonpermanent service-connected disability of 100% that results from blindness or any other disabling cause; authorizing a county or municipal corporation, notwithstanding certain provisions of the Act, to enact a law limiting eligibility for the tax credit; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Dwelling House of Disabled Veterans - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-04-02 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {123729/1 Adopted |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-10-18 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB6 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Counties
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Physically Disabled Persons
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Physically Disabled Persons
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 265 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |