MD HB596 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1284
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a lease of county property for a term of 5 years or less made by Dorchester County from certain notice requirements.
Title
Dorchester County - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-28 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1284 (Carry Over) 2023-02-24 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
SB810 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
SB810 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 10 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0596?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0596f.pdf |