MD HB505 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating for hunting and fishing licenses issued by the Department of Natural Resources an exception to the requirement that a licensing authority require a license applicant to disclose the Social Security number of the applicant and record the Social Security number on the application; altering the information that a request for information from a hunting or fishing license application made by the Child Support Enforcement Administration is required to contain under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security Number
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Disclosure
Family Law
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Privacy
Social Security
Support of Dependents
Disclosure
Family Law
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Privacy
Social Security
Support of Dependents