MD HB497 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the fee for nonresident sika deer stamps from $25 to $200.
Title
Hunting - Nonresident Sika Deer Stamp - Fee Alteration
Sponsors
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment 253320/1 (Senator Mautz) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment 253320/1 (Senator Mautz) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592 |
2024-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-9) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {253320/1 (Senator Mautz) Rejected (14-31) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-41) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713127/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |