MD HB440 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the driver of a school vehicle from allowing specified individuals to board or ride on the school vehicle, subject to specified exceptions; and authorizing specified individuals to board or ride on a school vehicle under specified circumstances.
Title
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268 |
2014-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {508071/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Education - Miscellaneous
Federal Government
Identification
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Safety
School Buses
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Federal Government
Identification
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Safety
School Buses
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous