MD HB396 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-21)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-21)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Disabilities, in cooperation with the National Federation of the Blind, to study and make recommendations regarding accessibility concepts in computer science, information systems, and information technology programs in higher education; requiring the Department to submit a preliminary report on or before December 15, 2015, and a final report on or before June 30, 2017, of findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-3) (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-3) (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503 |
2014-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {254337/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-3) |
2014-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {794566/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Blind Persons
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Higher Education
Information Technology, Department of
Legislation
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Blind Persons
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Higher Education
Information Technology, Department of
Legislation
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology