MD HB35 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission and specified electric companies to establish priorities for targeting remediation projects; establishing an Electric Reliability Remediation Fund in the Commission; providing for the purpose, administration, investment, sources, and permissible uses of the Fund; requiring that specified electric companies maintain the reliability of their distribution systems in accordance with specified standards; requiring that specified civil penalties be paid into the Fund; etc.
Title
Electric Reliability - Priorities and Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581 |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {577777/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-11-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fines
High Voltage Lines
Penalties and Sentences
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Equipment
Fines
High Voltage Lines
Penalties and Sentences
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Utilities
Utility Regulation