MD HB280 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB55
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county or a municipality to establish a certain fund for the purpose of providing support for the repair of infrastructure in a community subject to a condominium association or a homeowners association; and requiring that certain property tax revenues be assigned to a fund created under the Act.
Title
Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298 |
2024-03-28 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-11) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-25) |
2024-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB55 (Carry Over) 2023-01-12 - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
SB446 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
SB446 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Subjects
Condominiums
Counties
Flood Control
Highways
Homeowners Associations
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Public Works
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Property - Local
Counties
Flood Control
Highways
Homeowners Associations
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Public Works
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |