MD HB264 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified income of specified individuals from the discharge of student loan debt under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to submit specified documentation to qualify for the subtraction modification; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Student Loan Debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321 |
2014-03-24 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Death
Disabilities
Education - Miscellaneous
Exemptions
Income Tax
Loans
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Taxes - Income
Disabilities
Education - Miscellaneous
Exemptions
Income Tax
Loans
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Taxes - Income