MD HB218 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition on a person on a dredge boat possessing or using specified devices attached to a dredge for steering it to the bottom.
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Dredge Devices
Sponsors
Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Del. Joseph Bartlett [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] |
Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. D Page Elmore [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (129-4) | |
2010-02-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Environmental Matters |