MD HB175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date applicable to the Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit to June 30, 2022; and extending the applicability of the credit to taxable years beginning before January 1, 2021.
Title
Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-40) (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-40) (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85 |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-40) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Floor Amendment {813526/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {175161/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |