MD HB175 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from using an applicant's or employee's credit report or credit history in determining whether to deny employment to the applicant, discharge the employee, or determine compensation or the terms, conditions, or privileges of employment; authorizing an employer to request or consider an applicant's credit report or credit history under specified circumstances; authorizing an applicant or employee to bring an action for injunctive relief, damages, or other relief for a violation of a specified provision of law; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Credit Reports and Credit Histories of Applicants and
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] |
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Sue Kullen [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Del. Kirill Reznik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-27 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Credit
Discrimination
Labor and Industry, Division of
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Credit
Discrimination
Labor and Industry, Division of
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0175.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0175f.pdf |