MD HB1545 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Directors of the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to establish a nonprofit subsidiary to operate all or a part of the University of Maryland Medical Center in order to bring specified Medical Center employees within the jurisdiction of the National Labor Relations Act; authorizing the Medical System Corporation, on or after October 1, 2014, to amend its articles of incorporation to add up to three voting members to the Board of Directors; honoring specified collective bargaining agreements; etc.
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-8) (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-38) (Y: 96 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Conway) Adopted (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Conway) Adopted (129-1) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-38) (Y: 96 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Conway) Adopted (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Conway) Adopted (129-1) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376 |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-8) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-38) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Schuh) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {834764/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m. |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2014-03-07 | House | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Conway) Adopted (131-0) |
2014-03-07 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Conway) Adopted (129-1) |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Education - Miscellaneous
Federal Government
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Medical Schools
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Education - Miscellaneous
Federal Government
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Medical Schools
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor and Employment