MD HB149 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $11,275,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of public facilities in Calvert County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-02-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/2 at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | First Reading Appropriations |