MD HB147 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that, under specified circumstances, Montgomery County acts as a unit of the State and, for the purposes of tort claims arising out of the administration of a specified State human services program by the county, the State shall be named as the proper defendant and damages shall be limited in a specified manner; altering the definition of "tort claim"; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts MC 13-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {992018/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties - Local Laws
Courts
Damages
Montgomery County
Notices
Social Services
Sovereign Immunity
Torts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties - Local Laws
Courts
Damages
Montgomery County
Notices
Social Services
Sovereign Immunity
Torts