MD HB1258 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the registers of wills for each county and Baltimore City to, in coordination, establish a centralized website for use by all registers to publish certain notice; altering certain requirements for publication of notice relating to the appointment of a personal representative, a request for judicial probate, and estates administered by a foreign personal representative; and repealing the requirement that a foreign personal representative record a certain certification with the register.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Estate Administration - Publication of Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Certifications
Counties
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Intergovernmental Cooperation
International Affairs
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Personal Representatives
Public Information
Real Property
Registers of Wills
Time
Certifications
Counties
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Intergovernmental Cooperation
International Affairs
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Personal Representatives
Public Information
Real Property
Registers of Wills
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 5 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 5 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 7 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 7 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |