MD HB1258 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Environmental Health Specialists to adopt regulations that include the establishment of a specified seasonal environmental health specialist-in-training program and a specified condition that an individual may not participate in the training program for more than 6 months within a consecutive 12-month period; requiring the Board, under specified circumstances, to place licensed environmental health specialists on inactive or nonrenewed status for a period not to exceed 4 years; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Environmental Health Specialists Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {876886/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Education
Environmental Health
Examinations
Fees
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Records
Rules and Regulations
Discipline
Education
Environmental Health
Examinations
Fees
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Records
Rules and Regulations