MD HB1253 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that, beginning December 31, 2014, for licensed hospice programs, the State health plan methodologies, standards, and criteria for certificate of need review for a jurisdiction demonstrating need first take into consideration the capability of current licensed hospice providers in that jurisdiction that have the infrastructure, capacity, and scale to meet the demonstrated need.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-05HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2014-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback