MD HB1232 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish and maintain a specified electronic information sharing system and to adopt regulations to implement the system; establishing the Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment to study the feasibility and appropriateness of adopting a pretrial risk assessment tool for use by the judicial officers in an advisory capacity and other specified duties; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the General Assembly and Governor on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System
Sponsors
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-10) (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Cardin) {123729/1 Rejected (39-91) (Y: 39 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Cardin) {123729/1 Rejected (39-91) (Y: 39 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-10) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) {123729/1 Rejected (39-91) |
2014-04-04 | House | Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {192511/3 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Arrests
Auditors and Audits
Bail
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Citations
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
District Courts
Electronic Government
Evidence
Judges
Legal Aid
Legislative Services, Department of
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Summonses
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Trials
Witnesses
Arrests
Auditors and Audits
Bail
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Citations
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
District Courts
Electronic Government
Evidence
Judges
Legal Aid
Legislative Services, Department of
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Summonses
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Trials
Witnesses