MD HB1203 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Strategic Infrastructure Revolving Loan Program in the Maryland Economic Development Corporation to make loans for targeted investments in real estate and infrastructure projects located in sustainable communities, priority funding areas, and transit-oriented development areas; establishing the Strategic Infrastructure Revolving Loan Fund; authorizing the Corporation, with certain approval of a certain governing body, to pledge certain revenues generated within a certain area for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Strategic Infrastructure Revolving Loan Program and Tax Increment Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {113528/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Boundaries
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Economic Development
Enterprise Zones
Environmental Matters
Fees
Foreclosure
Forms
Hospitals
Housing
Interest
Liens
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Works
Real Estate
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Security Interests
State Aid
Time
Titles
Transportation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Economic Development
Enterprise Zones
Environmental Matters
Fees
Foreclosure
Forms
Hospitals
Housing
Interest
Liens
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Works
Real Estate
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Security Interests
State Aid
Time
Titles
Transportation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |