MD HB1193 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-12)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Implementation of Strategies for Preventing Sexual Exploitation of Clients by Health Professionals; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Implementation of Strategies for Preventing Sexual Exploitation of Clients by Health Professionals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Patients
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Victims
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Patients
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sunset
Victims