MD HB1169 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain licensees to post a certain sign in a certain location; altering the minimum age, from 18 to 21, for an individual to purchase or be sold tobacco products; exempting certain individuals from a certain minimum age requirement for an individual to purchase or be sold tobacco products; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to conduct inspections of licensed retailers; authorizing the Department to use certain individuals under the age of 21 years to assist in conducting a certain inspection; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsors
Del. Dereck Davis [D] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Del. Michael Busch [D] |
Del. Pamela Queen [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-35) (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {553729/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (27-20) (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-39) (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {633924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (36-88) (Y: 37 N: 89 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-35) (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {553729/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (27-20) (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-39) (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {633924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (36-88) (Y: 37 N: 89 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396 |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-35) |
2019-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {553729/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (27-20) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-39) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {633924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (36-88) |
2019-03-16 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {963691/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Armed Forces
Business Regulation and Occupations
Carroll County
Cecil County
Cigarettes
Circuit Courts
Citations
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Counties
Courts
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Garrett County
Governor
Health
Health, Department of
Hearings
Identification
Inspections
Licenses
Minors
Montgomery County
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Smoking
St. Mary's County
Tobacco
Vending Machines
Work, Labor and Employment
Armed Forces
Business Regulation and Occupations
Carroll County
Cecil County
Cigarettes
Circuit Courts
Citations
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Counties
Courts
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Garrett County
Governor
Health
Health, Department of
Hearings
Identification
Inspections
Licenses
Minors
Montgomery County
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Smoking
St. Mary's County
Tobacco
Vending Machines
Work, Labor and Employment