MD HB1162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the 9-1-1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup to identify and examine recruitment and retention challenges that affect 9-1-1 specialists in the State; and requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2024 and a final report on or before December 1, 2025.
Title
9-1-1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253920/1 Adopted |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {893723/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1034 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Management, Department of
Emergency Services
Health Insurance
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
Sunset
Workers' Compensation
Emergency Management, Department of
Emergency Services
Health Insurance
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
Sunset
Workers' Compensation